WA HB2816 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Nurturing positive social and emotional school and classroom climates.
Title
Nurturing positive social and emotional school and classroom climates.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Corry [R] | Rep. Mike Steele [R] | Rep. Michelle Caldier [R] | Rep. Luanne Van Werven [R] |
Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Kelly Chambers [R] | Sen. Matt Boehnke [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-31 | House | Chapter 235, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate adheres to its position. |
2020-03-10 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-18 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-06 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |