WA HB2825 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting oil-free hydroelectric turbine technology.
Title
Promoting oil-free hydroelectric turbine technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-03-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-10 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-03-10 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-10 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |