WA HB2826 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 3/25/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 3/25/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the authority of the liquor and cannabis board to regulate marijuana vapor products.
Title
Clarifying the authority of the liquor and cannabis board to regulate marijuana vapor products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | House | Effective date 3/25/2020. |
2020-03-25 | House | Chapter 133, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-08 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-06 | House | COG - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6579 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-23 - First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.