WA HB2828 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting funds available to port districts from being allocated for the purchase of fully automated marine container cargo handling equipment.
Title
Prohibiting funds available to port districts from being allocated for the purchase of fully automated marine container cargo handling equipment.
Sponsors
Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Alex Ybarra [R] |
Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] |
Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6535 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-03 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2828&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2828.pdf |