WA HB2833 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the board of engineers and land surveyors' appointment of its director and agreement with the department of licensing.
Title
Concerning the board of engineers and land surveyors' appointment of its director and agreement with the department of licensing.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Hoff [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | House | Chapter 47, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2020-02-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-04 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6323 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.