WA HB2840 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing additional funding for the business licensing service program administered by the department of revenue.
Title
Providing additional funding for the business licensing service program administered by the department of revenue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-19 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6632 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-25 - Effective date 7/1/2020.