WA HB2907 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing counties with populations over two million to impose an excise tax on business.
Title
Authorizing counties with populations over two million to impose an excise tax on business.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6669 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-03 - First reading, referred to Ways & Means.