WA HB2916 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning voters' pamphlets for overseas and service voters.
Title
Concerning voters' pamphlets for overseas and service voters.
Sponsors
Rep. Gina Mosbrucker [R] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] |
Rep. Larry Hoff [R] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Jesse Johnson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-05 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-31 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2916&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2916.pdf |