WA HB2943 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a business and occupation tax preference for behavioral health administrative services organizations.
Title
Providing a business and occupation tax preference for behavioral health administrative services organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-03 | House | Governor vetoed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |