WA HB2950 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing affordable housing needs through the multifamily housing tax exemption by providing an extension of the exemption until January 1, 2022, for certain properties currently receiving a twelve-year exemption and by convening a work group.
Title
Addressing affordable housing needs through the multifamily housing tax exemption by providing an extension of the exemption until January 1, 2022, for certain properties currently receiving a twelve-year exemption and by convening a work group.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-31 | House | Chapter 237, 2020 Laws PV. |
2020-03-31 | House | Governor partially vetoed. |
2020-03-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-07 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-03-07 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |