WA HB2965 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Effective date 3/17/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the state's response to the novel coronavirus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the state's response to the novel coronavirus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17HouseEffective date 3/17/2020.
2020-03-17HouseChapter 7, 2020 Laws.
2020-03-17HouseGovernor signed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-12HousePassed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-12HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2020-03-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-12SenateFloor amendment
2020-03-12SenateReturned to second reading for amendment.
2020-03-12SenateRules suspended.
2020-03-12SenateSenate receded from amendments.
2020-03-11HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments.
2020-03-04SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-04SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-04SenateFloor amendment
2020-03-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar.
2020-03-03HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-03HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-03HouseFloor amendment
2020-03-02HousePlaced on second reading.
2020-03-02HouseFirst Reading.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2965&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2965.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2965.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2965.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/2965.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=122950&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-03-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2965&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=122950&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2965&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=122950&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-12-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2965&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=122950&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-12-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2965&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback