WA HJM4015 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting Congress to establish a United States Space Academy in Washington state.
Title
Requesting Congress to establish a United States Space Academy in Washington state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-29 | House | ITED - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development. |