WA SB5021 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Granting interest arbitration to department of corrections employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Granting interest arbitration to department of corrections employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-04-30SenateChapter 233, 2019 Laws.
2019-04-30SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-25SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-23SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-19SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-19SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-10HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 83; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 6.
2019-04-10HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-10HouseCommittee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
2019-04-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-06HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-06HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-26HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-26HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
2019-03-04SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-04SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-04Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-02-28SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-27SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-25SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-25SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-01-24SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-01-24SenateLBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-24SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-17SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1042 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-22 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5021&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5021.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5021-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5021-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5021-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5021-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117013&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5021&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117013&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-10-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5021&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117013&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-19-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5021&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback