WA SB5022 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Granting binding interest arbitration rights to certain higher education uniformed personnel.
Title
Granting binding interest arbitration rights to certain higher education uniformed personnel.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Chapter 234, 2019 Laws PV. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 68; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-06 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-06 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-26 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |