WA SB5023 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning an ethnic studies curriculum for public school students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning an ethnic studies curriculum for public school students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-07SenateChapter 279, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-07SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-25SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-23SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-18SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 33; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-18SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 5.
2019-04-04HousePlaced on third reading.
2019-04-04HouseCommittee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
2019-04-03HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-26HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-26HouseED - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.
2019-03-04SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-04SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-04Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-20SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-18SenateWM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2019-02-18SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-07SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-01-25SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-01-25SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-01-25SenateEDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5023&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5023.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5023-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5023-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5023-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117022&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5023&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117022&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-04-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5023&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117022&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-18-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5023&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback