WA SB5024 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the transparency of local taxing districts.
Title
Concerning the transparency of local taxing districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-26 | House | LG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-04-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-28 | House | LG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-13 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |