WA SB5027 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning extreme risk protection orders.
Title
Concerning extreme risk protection orders.
Sponsors
Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Chapter 246, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 31; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on third reading. |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2019-04-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-28 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-07 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |