WA SB5028 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Declaring September the month of the kindergartner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Declaring September the month of the kindergartner.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-04-29SenateChapter 179, 2019 Laws.
2019-04-29SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-25SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-23HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-18SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-17HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-17HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-17HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-19HouseSGOV - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-19HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-11HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-27HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
2019-02-26SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-02-26SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-26Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-12SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-01-28SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-01-25SenateEDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2018-12-18SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5028&year=2019
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5028.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5028-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5028-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5028-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117041&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-26-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5028&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117041&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-17-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5028&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback