WA SB5035 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 1/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Enhancing the prevailing wage laws to ensure contractor and owner accountability and worker protection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhancing the prevailing wage laws to ensure contractor and owner accountability and worker protection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateEffective date 1/1/2020.
2019-05-07SenateChapter 242, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-07SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-25SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-23SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-19SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 34; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-19SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-10HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 59; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-04-10HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-10HouseCommittee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
2019-04-09HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-06HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-21HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-21HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-21HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-04HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
2019-03-01SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-01SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-01SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-01Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-14SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-12SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-12SenateLBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-12SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 11:00 AM.
2019-02-05SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2018-12-21SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1072 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5035&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5035.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5035-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5035-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5035-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5035-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117051&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-01-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5035&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117051&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-10-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5035&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117051&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-19-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5035&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback