WA SB5036 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the compensation of commissioners of certain metropolitan park districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the compensation of commissioners of certain metropolitan park districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-20HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-20HouseLG - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-20HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-18HouseFirst reading, referred to Local Government.
2019-02-15SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-02-15SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-01-25SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-01-23SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-01-22SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-01-22SenateLGOV - Majority; do pass.
2019-01-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-17SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Local Government.
2018-12-24SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1092 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback