WA SB5051 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Incentivizing the development of commercial office space in cities with a population of greater than fifty thousand and located in a county with a population of less than one million five hundred thousand.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Incentivizing the development of commercial office space in cities with a population of greater than fifty thousand and located in a county with a population of less than one million five hundred thousand.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-02HouseReferred to Finance.
2019-03-28HouseLG - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-27HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Local Government.
2019-03-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-03-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-12SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-12Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-01-25SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-01-23SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-01-22SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-01-22SenateFIET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM.
2019-01-17SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM.
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade.
2018-12-24SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback