WA SB5054 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the behavioral health workforce by establishing a reciprocity program to increase the portability of behavioral health licenses and certifications.
Title
Increasing the behavioral health workforce by establishing a reciprocity program to increase the portability of behavioral health licenses and certifications.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Sharon Brown [R] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] |
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Chapter 351, 2019 Laws PV. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2019-04-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-04-02 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-27 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-15 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-12-24 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |