WA SB5055 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing availability of peer services for persons with behavioral health disorders.
Title
Increasing availability of peer services for persons with behavioral health disorders.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-12-24 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5055&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5055.pdf |