WA SB5057 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting youth from tobacco products and vapor products by increasing the minimum legal age of sale of tobacco and vapor products.
Title
Protecting youth from tobacco products and vapor products by increasing the minimum legal age of sale of tobacco and vapor products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1074 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-05 - Effective date 1/1/2020.