WA SB5073 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state reimbursement of election costs.
Title
Concerning state reimbursement of election costs.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Brad Hawkins [R] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1291 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5073&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5073.pdf |