WA SB5074 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the uniform faithful presidential electors act.
Title
Enacting the uniform faithful presidential electors act.
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Chapter 143, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-22 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-27 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1539 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.