WA SB5076 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing persons complying with conditions of community custody to be registered to vote.
Title
Allowing persons complying with conditions of community custody to be registered to vote.
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] |
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |