WA SB5078 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring disclosure of federal income tax returns of presidential and vice presidential candidates prior to appearing on the ballot.
Title
Requiring disclosure of federal income tax returns of presidential and vice presidential candidates prior to appearing on the ballot.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-03 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-04-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-14 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Held on second reading. |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |