WA SB5082 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creating a committee to promote and expand social emotional learning.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a committee to promote and expand social emotional learning.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-13SenateChapter 386, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-13SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-29SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-27HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-26SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-25SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 29; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-25SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-24HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 71; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-04-24HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-24HouseFloor amendment
2019-04-24HouseReturned to second reading for amendment.
2019-04-24HouseRules suspended.
2019-04-24HouseHouse receded from amendments.
2019-04-22SenateSenate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments.
2019-04-10HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 71; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-04-10HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-10HouseCommittee amendment
2019-04-09HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-02HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-28HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-28HouseED - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.
2019-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-06Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-28SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-26SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-26SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-25SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-07SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-01-25SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-01-25SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-01-25SenateEDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2019-01-04SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5082&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5082.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5082-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5082-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5082-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5082-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117117&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5082&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117117&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-10-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5082&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117117&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-24-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5082&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117117&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-25-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5082&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback