WA SB5088 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Awarding credits for computer science.
Title
Awarding credits for computer science.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Chapter 180, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 3; excused, 0. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2019-04-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-28 | House | ED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-14 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | WM - Majority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |