WA SB5090 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing wage and salary information.
Title
Addressing wage and salary information.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 5:45 PM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:05 PM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |