WA SB5091 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state and federal special education funding.
Title
Concerning state and federal special education funding.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 387, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-27 | House | Committee amendment |
2019-04-27 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2019-04-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-08 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-26 | House | ED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-12 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Vote on final passage will be reconsidered. |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-03-09 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 12:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |