WA SB5093 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Enhancing litter control along state highways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhancing litter control along state highways.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-28HouseENVI - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 9:00 AM.
2019-03-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-07HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.
2019-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-05Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-27SenateTRAN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Transportation.
2019-02-07SenateAnd refer to Transportation.
2019-02-07SenateENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-07SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-31SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
2019-01-07SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback