WA SB5096 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning short-term case aides that provide temporary assistance for foster parents.
Title
Concerning short-term case aides that provide temporary assistance for foster parents.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-11 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2031 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.