WA SB5115 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning appliance efficiency standards.
Title
Concerning appliance efficiency standards.
Sponsors
Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1444 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.