WA SB5116 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 5/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 5/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting Washington's clean energy economy and transitioning to a clean, affordable, and reliable energy future.
Title
Supporting Washington's clean energy economy and transitioning to a clean, affordable, and reliable energy future.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Effective date 5/7/2019. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Chapter 288, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee amendment |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-04-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-02 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-29 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2019-03-19 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-19 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-14 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Third reading. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Held on second reading. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1211 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.