WA SB5120 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Contracting with private correctional facilities for the transfer or placement of offenders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contracting with private correctional facilities for the transfer or placement of offenders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-26HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-26HousePS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety.
2019-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-06SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-06Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-27SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-27SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-27SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-07SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-07SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-07SenateHSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-07SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
2019-01-10SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback