WA SB5124 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/31/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/31/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning appraisal management company Title XI compliance and license expiration.
Title
Concerning appraisal management company Title XI compliance and license expiration.
Sponsors
Sen. Mona Das [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | Senate | Effective date 7/31/2019*. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Chapter 74, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-13 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-01 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 2. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |