WA SB5127 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the traumatic brain injury fee.
Title
Increasing the traumatic brain injury fee.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Billig [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] |
Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Chapter 181, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-03-07 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1585 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.