WA SB5135 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Preventing toxic pollution that affects public health or the environment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preventing toxic pollution that affects public health or the environment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-08SenateChapter 292, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-08SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-25SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-24SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-22SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-15HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-15HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-15HouseCommittee amendment
2019-04-12HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-04-08HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-04-02HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-02HouseENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM.
2019-04-01HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.
2019-03-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-03-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-07Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-26SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-26SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-26SenateWM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Environment, Energy & Technology.
2019-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-14SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-14SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-14SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-14SenateENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-14SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-12SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
2019-01-11SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1194 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-15 - Referred to Appropriations.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5135&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5135.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5135-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5135-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5135-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117496&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-07-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5135&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117496&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-15-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5135&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117496&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-22-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5135&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback