WA SB5141 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning school resource officer mandatory training and policies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning school resource officer mandatory training and policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-28HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-28HouseED - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-07HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.
2019-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-05Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-27SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-27SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-06SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-06SenateEDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-30SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2019-01-11SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback