WA SB5145 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of hydraulic fracturing in the exploration for and production of oil and natural gas.
Title
Concerning the use of hydraulic fracturing in the exploration for and production of oil and natural gas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Chapter 294, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2019-04-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-03 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |