WA SB5147 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing tax relief to females by exempting feminine hygiene products from retail sales and use tax.
Title
Providing tax relief to females by exempting feminine hygiene products from retail sales and use tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-03 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2020. |
2020-04-03 | Senate | Chapter 350, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-09 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-03-07 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; without recommendation. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |