WA SB5155 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing residential marijuana agriculture.
Title
Allowing residential marijuana agriculture.
Sponsors
Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1131 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5155&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5155.pdf |