WA SB5159 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the definition of eligible pupil for purposes of the transitional bilingual instruction program.
Title
Concerning the definition of eligible pupil for purposes of the transitional bilingual instruction program.
Sponsors
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1425 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5159&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5159.pdf |