WA SB5160 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning property tax exemptions for service-connected disabled veterans and senior citizens.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning property tax exemptions for service-connected disabled veterans and senior citizens.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-21SenateChapter 453, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-21SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-29SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-28HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-28SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-28SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 35; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-04-28SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-27HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-27HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-27HouseFloor amendment
2019-04-27HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2019-04-26HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-26HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-26HouseFIN - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.
2019-03-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-07SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-07Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-26SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-26SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-26SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-25SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-21SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-20SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-31SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-01-21SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-01-21SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-01-21SenateHSA - Majority; do pass.
2019-01-21SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-18SenateReferred to Housing Stability & Affordability.
2019-01-17SenateAnd refer to Housing Stability & Affordability.
2019-01-17SenateWM - Majority; without recommendation.
2019-01-17SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5160&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5160.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5160-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5160-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5160-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5160-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117527&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-07-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5160&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117527&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-27-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5160&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117527&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-28-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5160&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback