WA SB5164 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 2/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 2/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing public assistance to certain victims of human trafficking.
Title
Providing public assistance to certain victims of human trafficking.
Sponsors
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 2/1/2022. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 136, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee amendment |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | APP - Majority; do pass without amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-26 | House | HSEL - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
2020-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | 3rd substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-14 | House | Returned to second reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on third reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-10 | House | WM - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-21 | House | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-21 | House | HSRR - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-03-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1971 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.