WA SB5165 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning discrimination based on citizenship or immigration status.
Title
Concerning discrimination based on citizenship or immigration status.
Sponsors
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 52, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-28 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2020-01-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-29 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-22 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-28 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |