WA SB5166 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing religious accommodations for postsecondary students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing religious accommodations for postsecondary students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 64 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-04-29SenateChapter 182, 2019 Laws.
2019-04-29SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-25SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-23SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-19SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 32; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-04-19SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-10HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 64; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 6.
2019-04-10HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-10HouseCommittee amendment
2019-04-08HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-02HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-28HouseCWD - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-27HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading, referred to College & Workforce Development.
2019-02-25SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-02-25SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-25Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-05SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-04SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-04SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-04SenateWM - Majority; without recommendation.
2019-02-04SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-01-29SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-01-29SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-01-29SenateHEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-29SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5166&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5166.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5166-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5166-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5166-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117533&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-25-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5166&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117533&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-10-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5166&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117533&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-19-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5166&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback