WA SB5167 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing the linked deposit program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing the linked deposit program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-27HouseITED - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development.
2019-03-08SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-08SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-08Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-14SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-12SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-12SenateWM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade.
2019-02-12SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-05SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-01-24SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-01-24SenateFIET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-24SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM.
2019-01-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM.
2019-01-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback